This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/25/2022 at 00:06:32 (UTC).

Dettamanti v. Kopcrak et al.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Dettamanti filed an Other lawsuit against Kopcrak. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9480

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Angelina Dettamanti

Los Alamos, CA 93440

Respondents

Linda Kopcrak

Rancho Alamo LLC

Durant Harvesting, Inc

Others

Branquinho Farming & Ranching, LLC

Ronald Carrari

James McKiernan

San Luis Obispo, CA 93405

David Y Farmer

Kevin Singer

SB County Public Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Mack S. Staton

Attorney at Mullen & Henzell

112 East Victoria Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Other Attorneys

Peter Laurence Candy

Attorney at Hollister & Brace

200 E. Carrillo St. Suite 100

Santa Barbara, CA 93102

Tiffany M. Carrari

Attorney at TMC Legal

P.O. Box 1315

Nipomo, CA 93444-3352

James C. Buttery

Attorney at Andre, Morris & Buttery

P.O. Box 1430

Santa Maria, CA 93456-1430

Mark A. Lester

Attorney at Lester, Schuck, Becker Dehesa & Hirschberg LLP

771 E. Daily Drive, Suite 230

Camarillo, CA 93010

Marilyn D. Anticouni

1234 Santa Barbara St.

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 4, 2022, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angelina Dettamanti Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angelina DettamantiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; order must be attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Designation by appellant; must be filed with the superior court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: appellant; $775 filing fee only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: must be cured by 5-4-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SB cert of mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: SB Civil Index

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 4/4/2022, Dettamanti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Barbara County Superior Court - Main; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: 18PR00334

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SB County Public Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Laurence Candy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marilyn D. Anticouni