This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/04/2023 at 18:01:20 (UTC).

Desarrollos Inmobiliarios Cuga, S.A.P.I. De CV v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Desarrollos Inmobiliarios Cuga, S A P I De CV filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zukin, Helen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1652

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Zukin, Helen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Desarrollos Inmobiliarios Cuga, S.A.P.I. De CV

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Helen Zukin

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Interested Parties

Landec Corporation

Curation Foods, Inc.

Kevin Gay

Doug Harman

Aaron Morris

Ardeshir Haerizadeh

John Barber

Dan Walton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Emil W. Herich

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1801 Century Park East Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2325

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Manuel Antonio Abascal

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathan Matthew Saper

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

355 S Grand Ave Ste 100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3104

Joseph Louis De Leon

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

355 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Katherine Anne Sawyer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

355 S Grand Ave Ste 100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3104

Brian Matthew Grossman

Attorney at Tesser Grossman LLP

11990 San Vicente Blvd. Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Madelynn Anne Hefner

Attorney at TESSER GROSSMAN LLP

11990 San Vincente Blvd., Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Heesok Park

Attorney at Park Lim

3530 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Daniel Lewis Allender

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park E Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Faryan Andrew Afifi

Attorney at Afifi Law Group

1801 Century Park East Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael David Kibler

Attorney at KIBLER FOWLER & CAVE LLP

11100 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste. 360

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Matthew James Cave

Attorney at KIBLER FOWLER & CAVE LLP

11100 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste. 360

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Charles Cardinal

Attorney at Kibler Fowler & Cave LLP

11100 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste 630

Los Angeles, CA 90025-3394

John A. Gladych

Attorney at Gladych & Associates, Inc.

1400 Bristol Street North, Suite 210

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S276093]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed July 15, 2022, the letter filed by real parties Landec Corporation and Curation Foods, Inc. on July 25, 2022, and the reply filed by petitioners on August 4, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in support of petition for writ of mandate and/or other appropriate relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee from RPI Landec Companies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real Party in Interest Landec Companies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest Landec Companies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real Parties in Interes Landec Corporation and Curation Foods, Inc.'s ("Landec Companies") letter dated July 25, 2022, re request to deny the writ petition filed by petitioner on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDEC CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant