This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/28/2022 at 01:03:13 (UTC).

Department of Social Services, County of San Luis Obispo v. J.H. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Department of Social Services, County of San Luis Obispo filed an Other lawsuit against J H. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, Margaret. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0188

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Johnson, Margaret

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Social Services, County of San Luis Obispo

Defendants and Appellants

J. H.

J. B.

Not Yet Classified

D. H.

Z. M.

B. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Attorney at Rita L. Neal, County Counsel

County Government Center, Room D320

San Luis Obispo, CA 93408

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Paul Adam Swiller

1901 First Avenue Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

Roni Keller

1560-1 Newbury Rd., #255

Newbury Park, CA 91320-3448

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Danielle E Plevel

Attorney at Danielle E. Plevel, A Prof. Law Corp

1320 Osos St.

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Roni Keller for aplt. J.B. (Mother); AOB + 30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Paul Swiller for aplt. J.H. (Father); AOB + 30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT vols 1-17 (530 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT 1-2 (571 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: conifidential ct 1 of 2 (93 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT 1 -2 (414 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: As to MOTHER'S notice dated 5-6-2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 5-6-2022 by MOTHER; from 04/28/2022 granting of WIC 387 petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 05/05/2022 by J.H. (father); from 04/28/2022 granting of WIC 387 petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 20JD-00133; Trial Court Judge: Johnson, Margaret

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle E Plevel