This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/21/2022 at 17:31:38 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING v. M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against M N FINANCING CORPORATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1527

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

M&N Financing Corporation

Mahmood Nasiry

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Appellants and Defendants

M&N Financing Corporation

Mahmood Nasiry

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Not Yet Classified

Civ. Code 5101

Consumer Attorneys of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosa Erandi Zamora

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Brian Jeffrey Bilford

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, PC

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1619

Ivan L Tjoe

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

445 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Allison A. Arabian

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Roy G. Weatherup

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Caroline E. Chan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, PC

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1619

Ivan L Tjoe

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

445 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Allison A. Arabian

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Roy G. Weatherup

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Caroline E. Chan

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kimberly Ann Kralowec

Attorney at Kralowec Law Group

188 The Embarcadero, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petitions for review are denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service reflecting service on Superior Court.M&N Financing Corporation, Defendant and Appellant Terry Anastassiou, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: 2nd petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M&N Financing Corporation Attorney: Terry Anastassiou ** Second petition **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Mahmood Nasiry Attorney: Allison A. Arabian Attorney: Caroline E. Chan Attorney: Roy G. Weatherup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Consumer Attorneys of California Attorney: Kimberly Ann Kralowec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B298901; Disposition: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC591206

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Consumer Attorneys of California is a litigant

Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant