This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/28/2021 at 02:00:14 (UTC).

Department of Fair Employment and Housing v. Cisco Systems Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Department of Fair Employment and Housing filed an Other lawsuit against Cisco Systems Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Takaichi, Drew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8910

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Takaichi, Drew

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Defendants and Appellants

Sundar Iyer

Ramana Kompella

Cisco Systems Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Attorney General

San Francisco, CA 94102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaya Mayim Mandelbaum

Attorney at Rudy, Exelrod, Zieff & Lowe, LLP

351 California St Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94104-2408

Jeanette Deon Hawn

2218 Kausen Dr Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758-7178

Melanie Lea Proctor

Attorney at Department of Fair Employment & Housing

2218 Kausen Dr Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758-7178

Janette L Wipper

Attorney at California Department of Fair Employment

2218 Kausen Dr Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758-7178

Michelle G Lee

Attorney at Rudy Exelrod Zieff & Lowe, LLP

351 California St Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Sirithon Thanasombat

Attorney at California DFEH

2218 Kausen Dr Ste 100

Elk Grove, CA 95758-7178

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Joseph C. Liburt

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Carolina Aicon Garcia

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe

1000 Marsh Rd

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1015

Lynne C. Hermle

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Andrew Stephen Esler

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Street Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Alexander John Hernaez

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Street Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Rex Heinke

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jessica Michael Weisel

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Sundar Iyer Attorney: Alexander John Hernaez Defendant and Appellant: Ramana Kompella Attorney: Alexander John Hernaez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Sundar IyerAttorney: Alexander John Hernaez Defendant and Appellant: Ramana KompellaAttorney: Alexander John Hernaez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Cisco Systems Inc. Attorney: Rex Heinke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Cisco Systems Inc.Attorney: Rex Heinke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed additional cites.; Notes: By respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondent *Filed conditionally under seal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The respondent's motion to file the certificate of interested parties under seal is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to file the unredacted certificate under seal as well as the redacted public version.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Application to file certificate of interested parties under seal, along with a public version.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Department of Fair Employment and Housing Attorney: Chaya Mayim Mandelbaum

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Default for applt Cisco Systems Inc. filed 4/9/21 CRC 8.100 The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2) Deposit or Fee Waiver for reporter's transcript not timely deposited/filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellants Kompella & Iyer, order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of Melanie L. Proctor in support of Plaintiff-Respondent's motion for calendar preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion for calendar preference by respondent Dept. of Fair Employment & Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sundar Iyer et al., filed 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant Cicso Systems Inc, order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cisco Systems Inc. et al filed 03/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: CV372366; Trial Court Judge: Takaichi, Drew

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant

Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant