This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/16/2022 at 04:42:52 (UTC).

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services v. Vanessa R. et al. ***FAST TRACK***

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against Vanessa R FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Shapiro, Gabriela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8904

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Shapiro, Gabriela

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Department of Children and Family Services

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Appellants, Defendants and Others

V. R.

B. P.

Hon. Gabriela Shapiro

Not Yet Classified

C. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Amy Z. Tobin

P.O. Box 4203

Santa Barbara, CA 93140

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822-1937

Jesse McGowan

Attorney at Law Office of Jesse McGowan

2794 Gateway Road Suite 109

Carlsbad, CA 92009

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Yvonne Massais-Joby

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2155

Other Attorney

Abby Hoffman

901 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 205

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL AFFIRMANCE AND REMAND OF ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Joint application and stipulation for conditional affirmance and remand to the superior court and issuance of immediate remittitur.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: B. P. Attorney: Jesse McGowan (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: B. P.Attorney: Jesse McGowan; Notes: (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. R. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. R.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm; Notes: (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Linda Rehm is appointed counsel for appellant Vanessa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 3/18/2022 by Brandon P. (Father) re minor: CK40820D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's appointed counsel's May 27, 2022 request to be relieved as appointed counsel. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The March 22, 2022 order appointing Amy Tobin as counsel for appellant Vanessa R. is vacated. Superior Court shall forward appellant's copy of the record to the California Appellate Project (CAP) forthwith. CAP shall provide the court with their recommendation for new counsel within 15 days from the date of this order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to be relieved as attorney of record for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Appellant's copy of counsel appointment order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Amy Tobin is appointed counsel for appellant Vanessa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 3/3/2022 by Vanessa R. (Mother) re minor: CK40820E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: CK40820; Trial Court Judge: Shapiro, Gabriela

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases where Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby Hoffman