This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/27/2021 at 08:50:24 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. S.B.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nguyen, Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9574

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Nguyen, Kim

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

S. B.

Others

M. T.

Hon. Kim Nguyen

Not Yet Classified

C. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Edelman'S Children Court 201 Centre Plaza Dr., Ste 1

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert Francis McLaughlin

31441 Santa Margarita Parkway Suite A-135

Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Other Attorney

Amy Esther McAllister

Attorney at Law Offices of Danielle Butler Vappie

1000 Corporate Center Dr., Suite 555

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Scott Toshio Iseri

Attorney at Children's Law Center

201 Centre Plaza Suite 7

Monterey Park, CA 91754

 

Court Documents

B289574

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final 25 pgs/The 4/11/18 orders are affirmed.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Lui, Elwood; Participants: Hoffstadt, Brian M. (Concur) Ashmann-Gerst, Judith Meisels (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) 25 pgs/The 4/11/18 orders are affirmed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice returned with proof of service.; Notes: county counsel waive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice returned with proof of service.; Notes: Robert McLaughlin (appellant) - waive;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: January 23, 2019 at 9:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. B. Attorney: Robert Francis McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. B.Attorney: Robert Francis McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: [re: rule 8 letter dated 7.19.18] AOB+30C-1 (105 pgs) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Dependency Appeals [re: rule 8 letter dated 7.19.18]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: Suspend briefing.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. B. Attorney: Robert Francis McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Atty McLaughlin dtd 7/19/18 re CT 4/11/18 last minute information; dispo case planin DK22205B; transcript of DVD interview of Juanita N; DVD interview of Christel N; RT: dtd 3/27/17, 5/8/17, 3/14/18 rptr: J. Felipe;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. B.Attorney: Robert Francis McLaughlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Robert McLaughlin has been appointed to represent appellant S.B. on appeal. (Appointment Order filed June 26, 2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: c-1 (301 pgs) r-1 (37 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 4/19/2018 S.B. father DK22205B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Toshio Iseri