This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 00:24:24 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. Marsha H. cons w/B318885 ***FAST TRACK***

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against Marsha H cons w/B318885 FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Price, Ashley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7889

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Price, Ashley

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

M. H.

Not Yet Classified

Z. H.

Other

Hon. Ashley Price

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Joseph D. MacKenzie

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH D. MACKENZIE

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Molly Elizabeth Thornton

Attorney at Childrens Law Center of Los Angeles

101 Centre Plaza Dr.

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The appeals filed January 13, 2022 and February 24, 2022 are dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeals filed January 13, 2022 and February 24, 2022 are dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supplemental brief received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: No merit brief letter sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. H. Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. H.Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: B318885. Appellant's motion to consolidate her appeal in Court of Appeal Case No.: B317889, with her subsequent, identical appeal in Case No.: B318885 is granted. All future filings shall be made under B317889. The time for appellant to file her consolidated opening brief by November 9, 2022 is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: to consolidate appeals.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Joseph MacKenzie for appellant M.H. [B318885]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (393 pgs) R-4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: [B318885]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Copy of appointment order for appellant M.H. returned as Refused-Unable to Forward. Also note that one USPS note says General Delivery Riverside CA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Intent filed on 2/24/2022 by M. H. (Mother) re minor: 20CCJP05182A - - * The February 24, 2022 notice of intent is construed to be a notice of appeal by order filed on March 22, 2022.[B318885]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Joseph MacKenzie for appellant Marsha H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed January 13, 2022 - Marsha H. (mother) 20CCJP05182A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP05182; Trial Court Judge: Price, Ashley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molly Elizabeth Thornton