This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/08/2022 at 05:02:43 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. M.A.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against M A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Newman, Tara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6447

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Newman, Tara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

M. A.

Others

G. S.

Hon. Tara Newman

Not Yet Classified

L. S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joseph D. MacKenzie

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH D. MACKENZIE

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorney

Etchu M. Tasinga

Attorney at Los Angeles Dependency Lawyers

901 Corporate Center Dr., Suite 580

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7695

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Shing Yan Lok

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2179

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed as abandoned; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.; Notes: Accordingly, M.A.'s appeal filed November 1, 2021, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: no supplemental brief filed. due by 3/9/22;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. A. Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie One extension granted for a total of 14 days:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. A.Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 14 days:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (602 pgs) R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: order appointing Joseph MacKenzie for M.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed November 01, 2021 - - M.A. (Father), re minor: 19CCJP06176A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19CCJP06176; Trial Court Judge: Newman, Tara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shing Yan Lok