This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/20/2023 at 02:52:18 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. J.J.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against J J. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brackelmanns, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8211

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brackelmanns, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Department of Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

J. J.

Others

J. I.

Hon. Lisa A. Brackelmanns

Not Yet Classified

R. J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Joseph D. MacKenzie

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH D. MACKENZIE

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorney

Benigno DeHoyos

Attorney at Los Angeles Dependency Lawyers

901 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 580

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Janna K. Eccleston

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: The ruling on the request for judicial notice is deferred for decision by the panel that will be assigned to decide this appeal after briefing is complete. Any party opposing the request may state its opposition in the opposing brief or in a separate filing. The parties may refer to the material that is the subject of the request for judicial notice in their briefs without prejudice to this court deciding either to grant or deny the request in the course of resolving the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. J. Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie Four extensions granted for a total of 102 days: 09/12/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/12/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/12/2022 By 30 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/14/2022 By 33 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/14/2022 By 33 Day(s) 11/14/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/28/2022 By 14 Day(s) 11/18/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/23/2022 By 9 Day(s) 11/23/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 12/23/2022 By 30 Day(s) 11/29/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 12/23/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 01/17/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. J.Attorney: Joseph D. MacKenzie; Notes: Four extensions granted for a total of 102 days: 09/12/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/12/2022 By 30 Day(s) 09/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/12/2022 By 30 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/14/2022 By 33 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/14/2022 By 33 Day(s) 11/14/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/28/2022 By 14 Day(s) 11/18/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/23/2022 By 9 Day(s) 11/23/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 12/23/2022 By 30 Day(s) 11/29/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 12/23/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Stratton, P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (316 pgs) R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Joseph MacKenzie appointed counsel for JJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed January 31, 2022 - - J.J. (Mother), re minor: 19CCJP04795B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19CCJP04795; Trial Court Judge: Brackelmanns, Lisa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janna K. Eccleston