This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/09/2023 at 07:03:07 (UTC).

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services v. Jair S. *FAST TRACK* *PHOENIX H.*

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against Jair S FAST TRACK PHOENIX H. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brackelmanns, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5615

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brackelmanns, Lisa

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

J. S.

Not Yet Classified

Z. S.

K. S.

Others

Y. A.

Hon. Lisa Brackelmanns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Amy Z. Tobin

California Appellate Project

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Carolina Yuki Eguchi Yamamoto

Other Attorney

Lianna Karchikyan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The appeal filed November 18, 2022 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed November 18, 2022 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No supplemental brief by appellant received. (supplemental brief was due 05/12/2023.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketDescription: No merit brief letter sent.; Notes: Phoenix H. notice sent to all counsel and appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. S. Attorney: Amy Z. Tobin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. S.Attorney: Amy Z. Tobin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Amy Tobin for appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcripts-3 (875 pgs) Reporter's Transcript-1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 11/18/2022 by Jair S. (Father) re minors: 20CCJP05970A 20CCJP05970B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP05970A; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP05970; Trial Court Judge: Brackelmanns, Lisa

[+] Read More [-] Read Less