This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/04/2023 at 08:58:48 (UTC).

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services v. F.A.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against F A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murillo, Tiana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5888

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murillo, Tiana

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

F. A.

Others

P. A.

A. C.

Hon. Tiana Murillo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

California Appellate Project

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jennifer Amelia Pardue

Other Attorneys

Laura Hindy Heller

Layla Marie Toma

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (397 Pages), ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 12/12/2022 by F. A. (Minor) re minor: 21CCJP04425A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21CCJP04425; Trial Court Judge: Murillo, Tiana

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less