This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 02:11:11 (UTC).

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services v. Darcy Q. *FAST TRACK*

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against Darcy Q FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Padilla, Steff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8035

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Padilla, Steff

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Department of Children and Family Services

Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

D. Q.

Others

N. C.

Hon. Steff R. Padilla

Not Yet Classified

I. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Navid Nakhjavani

Attorney at Office of Los Angeles County Counsel

500 W Temple Street 6Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822-1937

Other Attorney

Billy Conway

Attorney at Los Angeles Dependency Lawyers, Inc.

901 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 205

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Janelle Ureta McCammack

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2155

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The parties filed a "Joint Application and Stipulation for Conditional Affirmance and Remand to the Superior Court" and "Memorandum of Points and Authorities," based upon which this Court finds there is no reasonable possibility the interests of nonparties or the public will be adversely affected by the requested conditional affirmance and remand, and the reasons for requesting remand outweigh the erosion of public trust and the decreased incentive for pretrial settlement. (See Code of Civ. Pro. 128, subd. (a)(8).) It is, therefore, ordered that the November 8, 2021, order terminating parental rights over Isaac C. is conditionally affirmed and remanded for the sole purpose of ensuring compliance with the ICWA and related California statutes. The matter is remanded with the following directions [...]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Joint application and stipulation for conditional affirmance and remand to the superior court and issuance of immediate remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. Q. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. Q.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Linda Rehm for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-5 (1263 pgs) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: D. Senff at Court Reporter Services re GEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 02/28/2022 By 35 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 02/28/2022 By 35 Day(s) * Request received 01/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Amended NOA filed January 20, 2022 - - D.Q. (Mother), re minor: 18CCJP06517B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed January 4, 2022 - - D.Q. (Mother), re minor: 18CCJP06517B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18CCJP06517B; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18CCJP06517; Trial Court Judge: Padilla, Steff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18CCJP06517; Trial Court Judge: Padilla, Steff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases where Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janelle Ureta McCammack