This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 05:06:43 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. D.P. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against D P. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marpet, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7913

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marpet, Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Department of Children and Family Services

Appellants and Defendants

D. P.

C. J.

Not Yet Classified

R. G.

Q. J.

Y. G.

Other

Hon. Stephen C. Marpet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julie E. Braden

4142 Adams Avenue # 103-410

San Diego, CA 92116

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822-1937

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Dwana M. Willis

Law Office Of Dwana M. Willis 281 E. Colorado Blvd., #39

Pasadena, CA 91102

Eric Diwag Esteban

Attorney at Children's Law Center of L.A.

201 Centre Plaza Dr #10

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Helen Hahn Yee

P.O. Box 3488

South Pasadena, CA 91031

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-6 (1730 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: C.J. (father); return to sender, undeliverable. NOTE: corrected address with Apt. #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: order appointing Linda Rehm counsel for C.J. (father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial as to minor 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial as to minors 17CCJP01899B and 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The notice of appeal filed by D.G. on January 27, 2022 in superior court case number 17CCJP01899B is a duplicate of the notice of appeal filed on January 13, 2022 and is dismissed without prejudice for that reason. The notice of appeal filed by D.G. on January 27, 2022 in superior court case number 17CCJP01899F is a duplicate of the notice of appeal filed on January 21, 2022 and is dismissed without prejudice for that reason. The notice of appeal filed by counsel for C.J. on January 28, 2022 in superior court case number 17CCJP01899F is a duplicate of the notice of appeal filed by C.J. on January 27, 2022 and is dismissed without prejudice for that reason.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notices of Appeal filed on 1/27/2022 by Daisy G. (Mother) re minors: 17CCJP01899B 17CCJP01899C 17CCJP01899D 17CCJP01899E 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 1/28/22 by Charles J. (Father) re minor: 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 1/27/22 by Charles J. (Father) re minor: 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: order appointing Julie Braden counsel for D.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: Updated packet for NOA filed January 21, 2022 - D.P. (mother) as to minor F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed January 21, 2022 - D.P. (mother) 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed January 13, 2022 - D.P. (mother) 17CCJP01899B 17CCJP01899F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899F; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899B; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01899; Trial Court Judge: Marpet, Stephen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dwana M. Willis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Hahn Yee