This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/30/2022 at 01:19:48 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. Diana A. ***FAST TRACK***

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against Diana A FAST TRACK. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8487

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Davis, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

D. A.

Not Yet Classified

Z. G.

Other

Hon. Stephanie Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822-1937

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Montrea S. Jara

Attorney at Children's Law Center

1040 W. Avenue J, Suite 1119

Lancaster, CA 93534-3329

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: No merit brief letter sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. A. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 06/27/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. A.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Linda Rehm for aplt. D.A./aob +30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (724 pgs) R-2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: NOTICE OF NO ACTION AS TO MINOR 20LJJP00095B: "The Notice of Appeal has been presented prematurely. CRC, rule 8.406(d), provides that a notice of appeal filed prior to the time prescribed is premature, but may, in the discretion of the reviewing court, for good cause, be treated as filed immediately after the rendition of the judgment or making of the order appealed." (Filed in Trial Court on 2/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on 2/9/2022 by Diana A. (Mother) re minor: 20LJJP00095A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20LJJP00095; Trial Court Judge: Davis, Stephanie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Montrea S Jara