This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/23/2021 at 00:06:23 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. A.M.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against A M. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arakaki, Akemi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9090

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Arakaki, Akemi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Children and Family Services

Department of Children and Family Services

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant

A. M.

Others

R. B.

Hon. Akemi Arakaki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Kim Nemoy

Attorney at Office of County Counsel

350 So. Figueroa Street, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tracey F. Dodds

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-2142

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lori N. Siegel

22287 Mulholland Highway Suite 112

Calabasas, CA 91302-5157

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jennifer Nicole Villavicencio

Attorney at Children's Law Center of Los Angeles

201 Centre Plaza Dr Ste 8

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Other Attorney

Kevin Michael Shannon

Attorney at Law Office of Jolene Metzger

901 Corporate Center Dr Ste 203

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7665

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Notice of change of address for counsel for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Department of Children and Family Services Attorney: Tracey F. Dodds One extension granted for a total of 36 days: 03/15/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/20/2021 By 36 Day(s) 03/16/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/20/2021 By 36 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 06/08/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. M.Attorney: Lori N. Siegel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Department of Children and Family ServicesAttorney: Tracey F. Dodds; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 36 days: 03/15/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/20/2021 By 36 Day(s) 03/16/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/20/2021 By 36 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Department of Children and Family Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's letter dated February 17, 2021, re ethical wall around employee with a potential conflict of interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. M. Attorney: Lori N. Siegel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. M.Attorney: Lori N. Siegel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (285 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 11/17/20 A.M. (mother) 17CCJP01782 17CCJP01782C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01782C; Trial Court Judge: Arakaki, Akemi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP03576; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17CCJP01782; Trial Court Judge: Arakaki, Akemi

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases where Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael Shannon