This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/19/2022 at 03:29:20 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. A.F.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against A F. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Soto, Philip. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4197

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Soto, Philip

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

A. F.

Not Yet Classified

C. F.

Others

T. F.

Hon. Philip L. Soto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Tracey F. Dodds

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel-Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-2142

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Mitchell Keiter

Attorney at Keiter Appellate Law

424 South Beveriy Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Melissa Chaille DeMuth

Attorney at Children's Law Center

101 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754

Other Attorney

Joseph Land

Attorney at Land Legal Group, APC

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/25/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 05/25/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: appellant's request to withdraw notice of lodging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. F. Attorney: Mitchell Keiter Two extensions granted for a total of 40 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 05/25/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Department of Children and Family ServicesAttorney: Office of County Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. F.Attorney: Mitchell Keiter; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 40 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: appellant's notice of lodgingrequest to withdraw notice of lodging filed on 4/5/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: The court has reviewed appellant's application for extension of time to file an opening brief filed March 16, 2022. Appellant's application is hereby granted, and an opening brief will be due no later than March 24, 2022. The default notice previously issued on November 16, 2021 will remain in effect, and failure to file the opening brief on or before the due date will result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal without further notice. IT IS ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Mitchell Keiter counsel for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: no financial affidavit filed (due by 11/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: an AOB was due by 11/15/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Financial affidavit sent.; Notes: 2nd attempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (289 pgs) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: Mother's original and amended NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Amended notice of appeal filed August 9, 2021 by A.F. (Mother) re minor: 21CCJP01413A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Financial affidavit sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed July 23, 2021 - A.F. (mother) 21CCJP01413A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21CCJP01413; Trial Court Judge: Soto, Philip

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Children and Families is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Land