This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/29/2022 at 02:03:15 (UTC).

Delsas v. Cruz

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Delsas filed an Other lawsuit against Cruz. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blancarte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6607

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Blancarte, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Cesar Delsas

Defendant and Respondent

Konnor Cruz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Minh Tri Nguyen

Attorney at Nguyen Lawyers, ALC

3777 Long Beach Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

David Belofsky

Attorney at BELOFSKY LAW GROUP, P.C.

537 W 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #0855 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Cesar Delsas Attorney: Minh Tri Nguyen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 24, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Cesar DelsasAttorney: Minh Tri Nguyen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (November 17, 2021 By Cesar Delsas ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 17, 2021 By Cesar Delsas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC610025; Trial Court Judge: Blancarte, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BELOFSKY