This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/20/2022 at 00:06:35 (UTC).

Delman v. Union Bank

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Delman filed an Other lawsuit against Union Bank. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Court, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2123

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Court, Michelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

David Delman

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Defendant

Union Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Tod V. Beebe

Attorney at Barton, Klugman & Oetting, LLP

350 S. Grand Ave., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3485

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's letter dated Oct 21, 2022 submitted on Oct 21, 2022 via truefiling has been rejected. The appeal was dismissed on Oct 20, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: [...] The court declines to issue a prefiling order allowing the appeal to proceed. (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subds. (b)-(c).) The appeal initiated by the notice filed on July 21, 2022 is dismissed. (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subds. (a)-(c).) As the matter was stayed (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subd. (c)) when Delman submitted for filing on October 11, 2022 a motion to transfer the action to Division Four of this court, permission to file the motion is denied. (Ibid.) The court reminds Delman that disobedience of the prefiling order prohibiting him from initiating new litigation in propria persona without obtaining leave of the presiding justice or presiding judge of the court where the litigation is proposed to be filed may be punished as a contempt of court. (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subd. (a).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Received proof of service of "Motion to Transfer Action to Division 4..."[Permission to file denied via the order filed October 20, 2022.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Received "Notice to Administrative Presiding Justice Elwood Lui Re: Motion to Transfer Action to Division 4..."[Permission to file denied via the order filed October 20, 2022.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to court's Aug 8, 2022 notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to court's Aug 8, 2022 notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice re vexatious litigant (CCP 391.7) - Matter stayed.; Notes: NOTICE TO PARTIES Pursuant to section 391.7, subdivision (c) of the Code of Civil Procedure, all proceedings are hereby stayed. It has come to the attention of the Court that David Delman has previously been found to be a vexatious litigant within the meaning of Code of Civil Procedure section 391.7, subdivision (a). Within 10 days of the date of this notice Delman shall show in writing "that the litigation has merit and has not been taken for purposes of harassment or delay." (Code Civ. Proc., sec. 391.7, subd. (b)). If Delman fails to respond to this notice in a timely manner, or if the response fails to demonstrate the merit of the action herein, the appeal shall be dismissed. (Andrisani v. Hoodack (1992) 9 Cal.App.4th 279, 281.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed July 21, 2022 by David Delman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC013073; Trial Court Judge: Court, Michelle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUFG UNION BANK N.A. FKA UNION BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEBE TOD VINCENT ESQ.