This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/03/2023 at 18:04:38 (UTC).

Delicious Foods, LLC v. Wildwood Packing and Cooling, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Delicious Foods, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Wildwood Packing and Cooling, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4739

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Delicious Foods, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

Wildwood Packing and Cooling, Inc.

Luke Woods

Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc.

Giumarra Companies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Gilmore

Attorney at Gilmore Magness Janisse

P.O. Box 28907

Fresno, CA 93729-8907

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. F. Smith

Attorney at Attorney At Law

1391 West Shaw Avenue, Suite D

Fresno, CA 93711

John Lawrence Migliazzo

Attorney at Michael J. F. Smith, APC

1391 W. Shaw Ave., Suite D

Fresno, CA 93711

Albro Lynn Lundy

Attorney at Baker, Burton & Lundy

515 Pier Ave

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254-3822

Evan Robert Koch

Attorney at Baker, Burton & Lundy

515 Pier Ave

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due in 40 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing and Receipt for Record on Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C9; 2636 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: R3; 151 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CTX & RTX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to ctrr Gregory on 11/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.; Notes: 11/8/22 for ctx

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: waiver of deposit of court reporter fees by ctrr Gregory for other respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: waiver of deposit of court reporter fees by ctrr Greta Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: 10/26/22; Waiver of Deposit of Court Reporter Fees obo applt; default cured

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Dear Counsel: It has come to this court's attention that we have not received the following: [X] The Civil Information Statement as required by rule 8.100(g) of California Rules of Court has not been filed. If a perfected Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days of the date of this notice, the court may impose monetary sanctions or dismiss the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 paid via CC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Counsel and Fresno County Superior Court: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Koch obo Resp Giumarra

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Gilmore obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Migliazzo obo respondents Wildwood Packing and Cooling, Inc. and Luke Woods

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: The copy of your notice of appeal filed in the superior court was not accompanied by the statutory filing fee of $775, as required by rule 8.100(b)(1) of the California Rules of Court. Your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the payment of said fee should be excused.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 8/1/22; atty Gilmore obo Applt/Pltf; 5/25/22 Judgment against Sunsweet, order re: Wildwood's Motion to Strike Sunsweet Pleadings and 5/31/22 Judgment against Delicious Foods

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 15CECG03406; Trial Court Judge: McGuire, Rosemary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wildwood Packing and Cooling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Giumarra Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where Delicious Foods, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Giumarra Bros. Fruit Co., Inc. is a litigant