This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/25/2023 at 00:19:38 (UTC).

Decuir et al. v. Jackson et al.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Decuir filed an Other lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dillon, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3134

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dillon, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Jeremy Decuir

Jessica Clark

Respondents and Defendants

Ronald G. Jackson

Pacific Union International

West Coast Escrow

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Lloyd A. Kirschbaum

Attorney at Law Offices of Lloyd Kirschbaum

222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Ste. 2000

El Segundo, CA 90245

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert T. Dolan

Attorney at Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

11400 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 425

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

Scott Brandon Mahler

Attorney at Garrett & Tully

225 S. Lake Avenue Suite 1400

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: THREE: Clerks (727 Pages), ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 10, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order granting relief from 8.140(b) default filed.; Notes: Good cause appearing, appellant's motion for relief from default filed December 2, 2022, for the appeal dated September 2, 2022, is hereby granted on condition that appellant forthwith pay reporter's transcript fees with the clerk of the superior court within ten (10) days. Failure to pay the fees/deposits and comply with this relief order may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion for relief from default filed.; Notes: appellant's motion for relief from default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default on appeal dated 11/28/2022; failure to pay RT fees/deposits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jeremy Decuir Attorney: Lloyd A. Kirschbaum Plaintiff and Appellant: Jessica Clark Attorney: Lloyd A. Kirschbaum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 04/24/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jeremy DecuirAttorney: Lloyd A. Kirschbaum Plaintiff and Appellant: Jessica Clark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jeremy DecuirAttorney: Lloyd A. Kirschbaum Plaintiff and Appellant: Jessica ClarkAttorney: Lloyd A. Kirschbaum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (September 02, 2022 by Jeremy Decuir and Jessica Clark. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's $775 filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 02, 2022 by Jeremy Decuir and Jessica Clark.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV16242; Trial Court Judge: Dillon, Timothy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less