This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/15/2023 at 23:15:55 (UTC).

Deck et al. v. Developers Investment Company, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Deck filed an Other lawsuit against Developers Investment Company, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1287

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Karen Deck

Emiko Matsumoto

Appellants and Defendants

Developers Investment Company, Inc.

El Toro Medical Investors Limited Partnership

Life Care Affiliates II, L.P.

Life Care Centers of American, Inc.

Forrest L. Preston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kimberly A. Valentine

Jody Cheryl Moore

Victoria Elena Fuller

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Don Howarth

 

Court Documents

G061287

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On March 24, 2023, we issued an opinion in this appeal. On April 5, 2023, the parties filed a stipulation for early issuance of remittitur. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the clerk of this court is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.272(c)(1).) SANCHEZ, J. I CONCUR: BEDSWORTH, ACTING P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Stioulation for early issuance of remittitur,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final Affirmed Sanchez/Bedsworth/Delaney; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Sanchez, Maurice; Participants: Delaney, Thomas A. (Concur) Bedsworth, William W. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) Affirmed Sanchez/Bedsworth/Delaney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause submitted. Don Howarth argued for appellants. Victoria Fuller argued for respondents.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: by respondents - motion for partial dismissal of severable appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondents motion to dismiss - exhibits in support of motion to dismiss is missing a table of content/index.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed.; Notes: by respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: S. Dorn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 04/18/22 - proceeding by rule 8.124 with RT's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Valentine Law Group associates in Victoria Fuller as co-counsel for appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By aplt Developers Investment Company, Inc. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00907787; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less