This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/10/2022 at 00:56:27 (UTC).

De Leon v. Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 De Leon filed an Other lawsuit against Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Horn, Frederick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9801

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Horn, Frederick

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Anthony De Leon

Appellants and Defendants

Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC

Jennifer Stewart

Other

The California Labor Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Sidney Noveck

Attorney at Employees First Labor Law

65 N Raymond Ave Ste 260

Pasadena, CA 91103-4508

Jonathan Pierre LaCour

Attorney at Employees First Labor Law

65 N Raymond Ave Ste 260

Pasadena, CA 91103

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Dylan B. Carp

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

50 California St Fl 9

San Francisco, CA 94111

Thomas G Mackey

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

725 S Figueroa St #2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorney

Jessica Lynn Fry

Attorney at Dept of Industrial Relations-DLSE

7575 Metropolitan Dr

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

G059801

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order granting publication filed.; Notes: The California Labor Commissioner has requested that our opinion, filed on November 17, 2021, be certified for publication. It appears that our opinion meets the standards set forth in California Rules of Court, rule 8.1105(c). The request is GRANTED. The opinion is ordered published in the Official Reports. MARKS, J.* WE CONCUR: FYBEL, ACTING P. J. GOETHALS, J. *Judge of the Orange Super. Ct., assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: By The California Labor Commissioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Marks, Linda S.; Participants: Goethals, Thomas M. (Concur) Fybel, Richard David (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: Affirmed. (Signed Published) (Marks) Fybel Goethals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause Called. Dylan Carp argued for appellants. Jonathan LaCour argued for respondent. Lisa Noveck present only for respondent. Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty. Jonathan LaCour will argue for resp - 15 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Dylan Carp will argue for aplts -15 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLCAttorney: Dylan B. Carp Defendant and Appellant: Jennifer StewartAttorney: Dylan B. Carp; Notes: 1 volume appendix (239 pages)One extension granted for a total of 31 days: 03/15/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/26/2021 By 31 Day(s) 03/15/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/26/2021 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 01/15/21 (8.124 without RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid By APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01142813; Trial Court Judge: Horn, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle Property Management Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA LABOR COMMISSIONER DLSE DIR. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRY JESSICA LYNN