This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/10/2022 at 14:12:18 (UTC).

D.D. v. Garvey School District

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 D D filed an Other lawsuit against Garvey School District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5057

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

D. D.

Defendant and Respondent

Garvey School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Marc Binder

Attorney at Binder Law Group, PLC

16633 Ventura Blvd Ste 602

Encino, CA 91436-1823

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Yaron Felix Dunkel

Attorney at CARPENTER, ROTHANS & DUMONT LLP

500 South Grand Avenue, 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 8/20/2021 by D. D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV34477

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARVEY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKEL YARON F