This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/05/2022 at 22:19:23 (UTC).

DCM-P1 v. RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 DCM-P1 filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0322

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

DCM-P1, LLC.

Respondents and Defendants

Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC.

Dakota Asset Services, LLC

Roosevelt Management Company, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Daniel Weisskopf

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Agoglia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia Defendant and Respondent: Dakota Asset Services, LLC Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia Defendant and Respondent: Roosevelt Management Company, LLC. Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: DCM-P1, LLC. Attorney: Stephen Daniel Weisskopf

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303878; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC677324

[+] Read More [-] Read Less