This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/08/2021 at 21:10:32 (UTC).

DCM-P1 v. RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 DCM-P1 filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0322

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

DCM-P1, LLC.

Defendants and Respondents

Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC.

Dakota Asset Services, LLC

Roosevelt Management Company, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Daniel Weisskopf

Attorney at LevotoLaw, LLP.

2029 Century Park E. Suite 420

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael John Agoglia

Attorney at Alston & Bird

560 Mission Street, Suite 2100 Ste 2100

San Francisco, CA 94105-912

Michael J. Agoglia

Attorney at Alston & Bird

560 Mission Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94105-912

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia Defendant and Respondent: Dakota Asset Services, LLC Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia Defendant and Respondent: Roosevelt Management Company, LLC. Attorney: Michael J. Agoglia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: DCM-P1, LLC. Attorney: Stephen Daniel Weisskopf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303878; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC677324

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCM-P1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Rushmore Loan Management Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGOGLIA, MICHAEL J