This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/06/2022 at 07:40:54 (UTC).

DAVIS v. LEVY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 DAVIS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LEVY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9660

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Keith Davis

San Diego, CA 92131

Respondents and Defendants

Harlan Levy

Kornfeld & Levy Certified Public Accountants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel P Fallon

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

Gerald Eugene McCarthy

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes, LLC

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Keith Davis Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Keith Davis Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D078727; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2020-00034013-CU-FR-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORNFELD & LEVY CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALLON DANIEL P