This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/30/2022 at 00:00:20 (UTC).

Davis et al. v. World Unity International, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Davis filed an Other lawsuit against World Unity International, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Terry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1429

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Green, Terry

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Jimmell A. Childs

Judea M. Collier

Muhammad Bilaal

Angelica Davis

Defendant and Appellant

World Unity International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Alfred O. Anyia

Attorney at Law Offices of Alfred O. Anyia

10545 Burbank Blvd, Ste 126

North Hollywood, CA 91601

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Bridget Kate Hockaday

Attorney at Hanger Steinberg Shapiro & Ash

21031 Ventura Blvd. Suite 800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Marc Steven Shapiro

Attorney at Hanger, Steinberg, Shapiro & Ash

21031 Ventura Blvd., Suite 800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6512

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to request, the appeal filed May 24, 2022 is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).) Respondent(s) shall recover costs on appeal. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.278(a)(1)-(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal for notice of appeal filed on July 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Appellant World Unity International's civil filing fee ($775)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed May 24, 2022 by appellant World Unity International, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV08247; Trial Court Judge: Green, Terry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO MARC S