This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/25/2023 at 10:20:47 (UTC).

Davis et al. v. Associated Koi Clubs of America et al.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Davis filed an Other lawsuit against Associated Koi Clubs of America. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0147

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Todd Davis, Sr

Bernadette Davis

Respondents and Defendants

Southern California Koi Club

Associated Koi Clubs of America

Other

Estate of Todd Anthony Davis Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff and Other Attorneys

Gary A. Dordick

Attorney at Dordick Law Corporation

509 S. Beverly Dr.

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4414

Elizabeth Anne Hernandez

Attorney at Dordick Law Corporation

509 S Beverly Dr

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4514

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Gary Lee Hoffman

Attorney at Koeller, Nebeker, Carlson & Haluck

3 Park Plz Ste 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed April 20, 2021, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to designate the record on appeal in a timely manner. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of Failure to Comply with Notice of Default RE: File a timely Designation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal, reinstate the appeal, and be relieved from default is GRANTED. The order of dismissal is VACATED and the appeal is REINSTATED. Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement shall be filed no later than 10 days from the filing of this order. Including a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered. Orange County Superior Court, Appellate Division is directed to accept the designation of the record on appeal, provided the designation is presented within 10 days of the date of this order. If appellant fails to comply, and the Superior Court notifies this court of the non-compliance, the appeal may be dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed on April 20, 2021, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to timely designate the record and failure to file a Civil Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100 (g). Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply with notice of default. RE: Designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: by aplts Todd Davis Sr. et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01031476; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less