This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/10/2021 at 00:04:46 (UTC).

David Salazar v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 David Salazar filed an Other lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6001

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

David Salazar

Defendant and Respondent

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Jack Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 W Sunset Blvd Ste 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Matthew Thomas Theriault

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 Sunset Blvd., Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Drew Raphael Ferrandini

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 Sunset Blvd., Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Yana Hart

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 Sunset Blvd., Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Lauren Elizabeth Anderson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 Sunset Blvd., Suite 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

William Alexander Delgado

Attorney at DTO Law

700 S. Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lauren Hudecki

Attorney at DTO Law

700 S. Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/30/2021 By 29 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Salazar Attorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/30/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Target CorporationAttorney: Lauren Hudecki Attorney: William Alexander Delgado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David SalazarAttorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Salazar Attorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David SalazarAttorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Respondent filed SCIF. Address on SCIF did not match what court has on file. Because this is Respondent's first filing with the court, changes were made in ACCMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Respondent's counsel to confirm address on SCIF is current and correct address. Counsel confirmed that it was.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Oct 27, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: dtd Oct 29, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Oct 23, 2020; David Salazar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS1919405; Trial Court Judge: Cohn, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUDECKI LAUREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELGADO WILLIAM ALEXANDER