This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/13/2023 at 03:12:25 (UTC).

David Koslow v. Data Ticket Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 David Koslow filed an Other lawsuit against Data Ticket Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klatchko, Kira. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9461

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Klatchko, Kira

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

David S. Koslow

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Respondents and Defendants

Data Ticket Inc.

Steven Anthony Napolitano +7

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Joseph Ferruzzo

Attorney at Ferruzzo & Ferruzzo LLP

3737 Birch St #400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Sean Edward Morrissey

Attorney at Ferruzzo & Ferruzzo, LLP

3737 Birch Street, Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David S. Koslow Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David S. KoslowPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Petition for Transfer of Decision(appellant in pro per)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Data Ticket Inc. Attorney: Sean Edward Morrissey Defendant and Respondent: Steven Anthony Napolitano +7 Attorney: Sean Edward Morrissey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Data Ticket Inc.Attorney: Sean Edward Morrissey Defendant and Respondent: Steven Anthony Napolitano +7Attorney: Sean Edward Morrissey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred; Notes: Ruling is reserved for consideration with the appeal on the request for judicial notice filed Feb 1, 2023. The request for a stay filed on Feb 1, 2023, is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: opposition to request for judicial notice due on before 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: appeal dtd Aug 25, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Aug 25, 2022; David S. Koslow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Aug 25, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Aug 23, 2022; no RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jul 27, 2022; David S. Koslow (order dtd Jul 25, 2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jul 27, 2022; David S. Koslow (order dtd Jun 29, 2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: CVPS2103087; Trial Court Judge: Klatchko, Kira

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less