This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/11/2022 at 02:18:21 (UTC).

Davchev v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Davchev filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Evangelista, Maria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3515

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Evangelista, Maria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ivan D. Davchev

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

Daria Dogalakova

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Laura M. Furniss

Attorney at Furniss Family Law Group, Inc.

499 Seaport Court, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94063

Interested Party Attorneys

Miles Archer Woodlief

775 East Blithedale Avenue Suite 514

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Constantine Zhukovsky

450 Taraval Street, Suite 147

San Francisco, CA 94116

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended POS to Petitioner's Reply Brief dated January 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Corrected Petitioner's Reply Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended POS to Petitioner's Reply Brief dated January 11, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Application to File Corrected Reply Brief (duplicate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Application to File Corrected Reply Brief (granted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Request to Consolidate Briefing of Reply in A163329 and A163515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Court Reporter's Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS MOTION TO QUASH AND DVRO, VOLUME IV FRIDAY, JULY 23, 2021Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS MOTION TO QUASH AND DVRO, VOLUME II THURSDAY, JULY 15, 2021Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS MOTION TO QUASH AND DVRO, VOLUME I TUESDAY JULY 13, 2021Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: APPENDIX VOLUME IV, pp. 582-674Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: APPENDIX VOLUME III, pp. 225-580Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: APPENDIX VOLUME II, pp. 113-224Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: APPENDIX VOLUME I, p. 1-112Note: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate Stay Requested Restraining Order Granted Without JurisdictionNote: Confidential Family Law and Restraining Order matters enclosed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: FDV21815634; Trial Court Judge: Evangelista, Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miles Archer Woodlief

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zhukovsky, Constantine