This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 01:23:10 (UTC).

Dasilvalopez v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Dasilvalopez filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanchez-Gordon, Teresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5093

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sanchez-Gordon, Teresa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rodnei Dasilvalopez

Respondent

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Melinda Lou Minkus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Danielle Marie Boyd

Attorney at MACDONALD & CODY, LLP

38 Executive Park Ste 280

Irvine, CA 92614

Michael John Cody

Attorney at MACDONALD & CODY, LLP

38 Executive Park Ste 280

Irvine, CA 92614-4747

Denetta Evelyn-Juanita Scott

Attorney at MACDONALD & CODY, LLP

38 Executive Park Ste 280

Irvine, CA 92614

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Teresa Sanchez-Gordon

Attorney at Dept. 31

Los Angeles Superior Court 312 North Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

John J. Glugoski

Attorney at Righetti Glugoski, P.C.

220 Halleck St Ste 220

San Francisco, CA 94129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Superior Court enclosing trial court's minute order issued in response to the Court of Appeal's alternative writ order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY: You are commanded, immediately upon receipt of this writ, either to:(a) vacate your order of August 4, 2021 in Los Angeles County Superior Court case number 21STCV18117, and thereafter make a new and different order sustaining the demurrer with leave to amend or, (b) in the alternative, SHOW CAUSE before this court, in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California when the matter is ordered on calendar, why you have not done so and why a peremptory writ of mandate requiring you to do so should not issue. If the respondent intends to comply with alternative (a) above, before doing so it "must give the . . . parties notice and an opportunity to be heard," as required by the Supreme Court in Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250-1251, fn. 10. Petitioner shall inform this court, on or before November 9, 2021, whether the respondent has complied with alternative (a), and shall serve and file any new order issued by the respondent. If the respondent complies with alternative (a) above, this court will promptly discharge the alternative writ and dismiss the petition as moot. In the event the respondent court fails to comply with alternative (a) above, a written return to this writ shall be served and filed on or before November 30, 2021. Petitioner may file a reply to the written return, within 20 days after the filing of the return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Real Party in Interest's motion to augment record (deemed exhibits in support of opposition)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Melinda Lou Minkus Attorney: John J. Glugoski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Melinda Lou MinkusAttorney: John J. Glugoski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on September 17, 2021 has been read and considered. The real party in interest is requested to serve and file opposition on or before October 8, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLUGOSKI JOHN