This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 02:01:08 (UTC).

Dart Container Corporation of California v. The Superior Court: Mike Bond

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Dart Container Corporation of California filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Mike Bond. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Firetag, Chad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9960

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Firetag, Chad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dart Container Corporation of California

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Mike Bond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer Marie Misetich

Attorney at Buchalter, APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Thomas Michael O'Connell

Attorney at Buchalter, APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Interested Party Attorneys

Moises Omar Ochoa

Attorney at Ochoa & Calderon

3685 Main Street, Suite 250

Riverside, CA 92501

Andre Rekte

Attorney at Rekte Law, APC

215 Cajon Street

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: and request for immediate stay Panel: Codrington-Ramirez-Slough

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Amended Petition & exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 2 vols

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: required corrections to exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Exhibits; pagination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and request for immediate stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less