This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/13/2023 at 10:01:14 (UTC).

D'Arcy et al. v. Andrews

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 D'Arcy filed an Other lawsuit against Andrews. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sturgeon, Eddie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0300

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sturgeon, Eddie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Caroline D'Arcy

Tara Andrews

Sinaoife Andrews

Respondent and Defendant

Joy Andrews

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Barbara L. Richards

Victoria Fuller

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jason Edward Turner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caroline D'Arcy Attorney: Barbara L. Richards Plaintiff and Appellant: Tara Andrews Attorney: Barbara L. Richards Plaintiff and Appellant: Sinaoife Andrews Attorney: Barbara L. Richards

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caroline D'ArcyAttorney: Barbara L. Richards Plaintiff and Appellant: Tara AndrewsAttorney: Barbara L. Richards Plaintiff and Appellant: Sinaoife AndrewsAttorney: Barbara L. Richards

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ***EXHIBITS LODGED BY: ******; Notes: Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit request rule 8.224 by:; Notes: Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 9/19/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Joy Andrews Attorney: Jason Edward Turner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Joy AndrewsAttorney: Jason Edward Turner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sinaoife Andrews Attorney: Barbara L. Richards

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Sinaoife Andrews

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Tara Andrews

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Caroline D'Arcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Sinaoife Andrews

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 3/24/22 - CT only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 3/14/22 by Caroline D'Arcy, Tara Andrews, Sinaoife Andrews

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2014-00084132-CU-MC-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Sturgeon, Eddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less