This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/10/2023 at 02:11:42 (UTC).

Daniel's Western Meat Packers, Inc. v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Daniel's Western Meat Packers, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Palazuelos, Yvette. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4885

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Palazuelos, Yvette

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel's Western Meat Packers, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Yvette M Palazuelos

Interested Party

Felix Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tony Blain

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Interested Party Attorneys

Atoy H Wilson

Kevin Mahoney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed on September 9, 2021, and the response of respondent court, filed on September 16, 2021, have been read and considered. Respondent court having vacated its order denying the statement of disqualification as untimely and the case having been sent for reassignment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition be dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed on September 9, 2021, and the response of respondent court, filed on September 16, 2021, have been read and considered. Respondent court having vacated its order denying the statement of disqualification as untimely and the case having been sent for reassignment, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition be dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: to the petition, by court counsel. Transmitted herewith is the trial court's minute order issued in response to the petition, vacating the order denying the peremptory challenge, accepting the challenge as timely, and returning the case to the Supervising Judge for reassignment. This should render the petition moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Opposition to the above-entitled petition by real party in interest shall be served and filed by 10:00 a.m., on September 23, 2021. Respondent court may serve and file an opposition on or before September 23, 2021. The briefs may be filed electronically via the court's e-filing service provider (TrueFiling).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: petitioner Daniel's Western Meat Packers, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less