This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/29/2023 at 01:23:20 (UTC).

Daniel Batlle v. AG Redlands, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Daniel Batlle filed an Other lawsuit against AG Redlands, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sachs, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9985

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sachs, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Daniel Batlle

Defendants and Appellants

AG Redlands, LLC

AG Facilities Operations, LLC

Jacob Winter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Allen Raffi Oghassabian

Christian R. Oliver

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Walker

Tracy Diana Forbath

Daniel R. Velladao

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellants' request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Opposition to appellants' request for judicial notice is due w/in 15 days after the filing date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: By appellants (Exhibits - 14 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 1 vol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: AG Redlands, LLC Defendant and Appellant: AG Facilities Operations, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Jacob Winter Attorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/26/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Daniel BatlleAttorney: Allen Raffi Oghassabian Attorney: Christian R. Oliver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: AG Redlands, LLC Defendant and Appellant: AG Facilities Operations, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Jacob WinterAttorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: AG Redlands, LLC Defendant and Appellant: AG Facilities Operations, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Jacob Winter Attorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: AG Redlands, LLC Defendant and Appellant: AG Facilities Operations, LLC Defendant and Appellant: Jacob WinterAttorney: Tracy Diana Forbath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 17, 2022; Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Oct 24, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Oct 14, 2022; AG Redlands, LLC et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2116544; Trial Court Judge: Sachs, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less