This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/05/2023 at 11:00:58 (UTC).

Dalle-Homme v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Dalle-Homme filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gould-Saltman, Dianna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9009

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gould-Saltman, Dianna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brody Dalle-Homme

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Dianna J. Gould-Saltman

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Joshua Homme

Others

Wolf Homme

Camile Homme

Alan Jackson

Elizabeth Little

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lisa Helfend Meyer

Attorney at Meyer Olson Loxy & Meyers, LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 1425

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Pola Sharon Baumgold

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group

437 S Rexford Dr

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4711

Gregory Edwin Wolff

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group

96 Jessie Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Claudia Ribet

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Doreen Marie Olson

Attorney at Meyer Olson Lowy & Meyers LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Sute 1425

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Amanda Brooke Harvey

Attorney at Susan E Wiesner, A Law Corp

9113 Sunset Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Herb Fox

Attorney at Law Office of Herb Fox

1114 State St. Suite 200

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Susan E. Wiesner

Attorney at Susan E. Wiesner, ALC

9113 W. Sunset Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90069-3106

Other Attorneys

Sonia B. Dujan

Attorney at Law Office of Sonia B. Dujan

5850 Canoga Avenue Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Kendra Thomas

21550 Oxnard Street Third Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The respondent court's March 11, 2022, order, to the extent it allows the paternal grandparents to remove the children from California, was stayed for 30 days, or through April 11, 2022. As no further remedy is available for petitioner in this writ proceeding, the petition for writ of mandate filed March 11, 2022, is now dismissed as moot. No costs are awarded in this proceeding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the immediate stay request filed March 11, 2022, the response filed March 16, 2022, and the reply filed March 18, 2022. The respondent court's March 11, 2022, order, to the extent it allows the paternal grandparents to remove the children from California, is stayed for 30 days, or through April 11, 2022. The custody exchange will take place on March 28, 2022, at 9:00 am, under the conditions specified in the respondent court's March 11, 2022, order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real Party in Interest's letter dated March 23, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply in support of petition for writ of mandate and requst for immediate stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to reply in support of petition for writ of mandate (Exhibits 10-18)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Response of real party in interest Joshua Homme to immediate stay request per March 11, 2022 order; declarations of Joshua Homme, Irene Homme, and Susan E. Weisner, Esq.One extension granted for a total of 1 day: 03/14/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/16/2022 By 1 Day 03/14/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/16/2022 By 1 Day Response to the immediate stay request issued March 11, 2022 by 2pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: [ THE COURT: Real Party in Interest's application for an extension of time to file the Response to immediate stay per the court's March 11, 2022 order is granted to March 16, 2022 at 2 pm. The reply is now due on or before March 18, 2022 at 2 pm. ]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Notice of association of Herb Fox from the Law Office of Herb Fox as co-counsel for Real Party in Interest Joshua Homme

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The request for an immediate stay is granted pending further order of this court. Real party in interest is directed to file a response to the immediate stay request by Tuesday, March 15, 2022, at 2pm, and any reply from the petitioner must be filed by Wednesday, March 16, 2022, at 2pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate (Immediate stay requested).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS KENDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUJAN SONIA B.