This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/01/2023 at 13:15:11 (UTC).

Dalle-Homme v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Dalle-Homme filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Riff, Lawrence and Gould-Saltman, Dianna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9421

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Riff, Lawrence

Gould-Saltman, Dianna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brody Dalle-Homme

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Dianna J. Gould-Saltman

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Lawrence Riff

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Joshua Homme

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Gregory Edwin Wolff

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group

96 Jessie Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Doreen Marie Olson

Attorney at Meyer Olson Lowy & Meyers LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Sute 1425

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lisa Helfend Meyer

Attorney at Meyer Olson Loxy & Meyers, LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 1425

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Claudia Ribet

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Pola Sharon Baumgold

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group

437 S Rexford Dr

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4711

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Susan E. Wiesner

Attorney at Susan E. Wiesner, ALC

9113 W. Sunset Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90069-3106

Herb Fox

Attorney at Law Office of Herb Fox

1114 State St. Suite 200

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate, including the exhibits, filed April 1, 2022, and the preliminary opposition, including the exhibits, filed April 7, 2022, and the reply filed April 8, 2022. The petition is denied. Petitioner fails to demonstrate that the respondent court abused its discretion in how it conducted the proceedings or in issuing its March 11, 2022, order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in support of petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition and request for immediate stay.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Five volumes of exhibits to preliminary opposition to writ of mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Real party in interest Joshua Homme's preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate and request immediate stay.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: For real party in interest Joshua Homme.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real party in interest Joshua Homme.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 1 through 5.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate (stay requested).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herb Fox

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIESNER SUSAN ELIZABETH