This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2022 at 01:54:30 (UTC).

Daleiden et al. v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Daleiden filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hite, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3488

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hite, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioners

David Robert Daleiden

Sandra Susan Merritt

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stephen L. Cooley

Attorney at Steve Cooley & Associates

5318 E. 2Nd Street #399

Long Beach, CA 90803

Brentford Joseph Ferreira

Attorney at Steve Cooley & Associates

5318 E Second Street #399

Long Beach, CA 90803

Horatio G. Mihet

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

P.O. Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Nicolaie Cocis

Attorney at Law Office of Nic Cocis & Associates

38975 Sky Canyon Drive, Suite 211

Murrieta, CA 92563

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Johnette Veronica Jauron

Attorney at Deputy Attorney General

California Department Of Justice 455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: e file notification sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate or prohibition is denied. Before: Margulies, Acting P.J., Banke, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate or prohibition is denied. Before: Margulies, Acting P.J., Banke, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: 2502505; Trial Court Judge: Hite, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnette Veronica Jauron