This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 00:40:27 (UTC).

D.A. v. Dignity Health et al.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 D A filed an Other lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ongkeko, Rafael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3734

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ongkeko, Rafael

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

D. A.

Respondents and Defendants

Dignity Health

Michelle D Henry

Keith A Kolber

David N. Steinberg

Scott A. Beasley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Robert Chivinski

Attorney at Chivinski Law Firm

1901 1St Ave 2Nd Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Kenneth M. Sigelman

Attorney at Sigelman & Associates

1901 1St Avenue 2Nd Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Bruce Packer

Attorney at Packer, O'Leary & Corson, A Prof Corp

505 N. Brand Blvd. Suite 1025

Glendale, CA 91203

Christopher P. Wend

Attorney at La Follette, Johnson, De Haas, Fesler & Ames

701 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 600

Glendale, CA 91203

David J. Ozeran

Attorney at La Follette Johnson DeHaas Fesler & Ames

701 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 600

Glendale, CA 91203

Raymond Leslie Blessey

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews & Blessey, LP

1230 Rosecrans Ave. Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Evan Naoyoshi Okamura

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews, & Blessey, LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Matthew Samuel Levinson

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Robert C. Reback

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews, & Blessey, LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Stephen Allan Diamond

Attorney at Reback McAndrews & Blessey

1230 Rosecrans Ave Ste 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Respondents' Notice of Firm's Change of Address effective Sep 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Matthew S Levinson of the law firm of Cole Pedroza LLP associates in as co-counsel of record for respondent David N Steinberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Matthew S Levinson of the law firm of Cole Pedroza LLP associates in as co-counsel of record for respondent Scott Beasley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: D. A. Attorney: Kenneth M. Sigelman [Judgment in favor of Scott A. Beasley]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: D. A. Attorney: Kenneth M. Sigelman (R)[Judgment in favor of Michelle Henry and Keith Kolber]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: D. A. Attorney: Kenneth M. Sigelman (R1)[Judgment in favor of David Steinberg]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: D. A.Attorney: Kenneth M. Sigelman; Notes: [Judgment in favor of Scott A. Beasley]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: D. A.Attorney: Kenneth M. Sigelman; Notes: (R)[Judgment in favor of Michelle Henry and Keith Kolber]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (R1)Civil filing fee paid for by Sigelman, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (R)Civil filing fee paid by Sigelman, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (June 21, 2021: appeal)Civil filing fee paid by Sigelman, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 21, 2021: Danny A. - (R1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 21, 2021: Danny A. - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (June 21, 2021: appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 21, 2021: Danny A.[Judgment in favor of Scott A. Beasley]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC712630; Trial Court Judge: Ongkeko, Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MATTHEW SAMUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKAMURA EVAN NAOYOSHI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAMOND ESQ, STEPHEN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OZERAN DAVID J