This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/02/2021 at 02:11:00 (UTC).

Curtis v. Viking Roof Service, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Curtis filed an Other lawsuit against Viking Roof Service, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coats, Benjamin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2466

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coats, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

James Curtis

Defendants and Respondents

Pescador Properties LLC

Viking Roof Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Lee Rudd

Attorney at The Rudd Law Firm, P.C.

4650 N. Sepulveda Blvd., No. 205

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

S. Martin Keleti

Attorney at Keleti Law

9903 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 751

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-1671

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Cynthia Coulter Mulvihill

Attorney at Law Offices of Craig A. Holtz

100 W. Broadway, Suite 1150 Suite 440

Glendale, CA 91210

Edward F. Morrison, Jr.

Attorney at The Morrison Law Group

77530 Enfield Lane, Suite H-1 35Th Floor

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Settled statment filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 10-12-21 from VCSC; Notice of Rescinding Default - Proposed settled statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant moves to vacate the dismissal of this appeal and reinstate the appeal. The motion is granted and the appeal is reinstated. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.60(d).) Within ten (10) days appellant shall cure all defaults, including filing a proposed settled statement with the clerk of the superior court. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.137(c).) If appellant fails to cure all defaults within ten (10) days of the date this order is filed, the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Counsel Christopher Rudd for aplt. James Curtis associates atty Martin Keleti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Appellant's Proposed Settled Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: [Proposed] Order Granting Appellan'ts Motion for Relief from Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated see 10-1-21 order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140, California Rules of Court, the appeal filed May 17, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: James Curtis Attorney: Christopher Lee Rudd

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104 for definition of 'entered"). A copy of this form must also be served on the other party or parties to this appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 6-21-21 from VCSC; Notice Rescinding Default ; designation filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 6-21-21 from VCSC; notice of election to proceed per CRC 8.124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: dtd 6-18-21; Appendix & Settled statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: dtd 6-2-21 from VCSC; to be cured by 6-17-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dtd 5-17-21 by J. Curtis; from 3-16-21 judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2019-00525328-CU-BC-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Coats, Benjamin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pescador Properties LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELETI S MARTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDD CHRISTOPHER LEE