This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/15/2022 at 22:09:50 (UTC).

Cruz v. City of Merced

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Cruz filed an Other lawsuit against City of Merced. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3402

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Jose Cruz

Defendant and Respondent

City of Merced

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Lina Balciunas Cockrell

Attorney at Messing Adam & Jasmine LLP

980 9Th St, Ste 380

Sacramento, CA 95814

Gary M. Messing

Attorney at Messing Adam & Jasmine LLP

980 9Th Street, Suite 380

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Phaedra A. Norton

Attorney at City of Merced, Office of the City Attorney

678 West 18Th Street

Merced, CA 95340

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/17/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Receipt for Administraive Record; 3 Volumes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: To Counsel re: AOB due within 40 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Administrative record received **********.; Notes: 3 Volumes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CTX, RTX & Record of Administrative Proceedings.RTX/1V/50 Pages (Paper)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1V/185 Pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Court Reporter Traylor on 12/16/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.; Notes: To Parties for CTX on 12/6/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/1/21; Respondent is not designating additional documents or hearings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 11/19/21; Applt failed to Post the required fee for preparation of the reporter's transcript Per CRC Rule 8.130(b).

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court Re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Cockrell obo Applt Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Goulart obo Respondent City of Merced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Respondent City of Merced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All counsel and superior court re: Mediation Screening Questionnaire due within 10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Cockrell obo Applt Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 obo Applt Cruz by Atty Cockrell (by credit card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Atty Cockrell obo Applt Cruz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Cockrell obo Applt Cruz appeals from order denying Petition for Administrative Mandamus entered 8/2/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Merced County Superior Court - Main; County: Merced; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV-02663; Trial Court Judge: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Merced is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phaedra Anne Norton