This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/15/2021 at 11:09:16 (UTC).

CRAYTON v. FCA US

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 CRAYTON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FCA US. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8702

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Brandon Crayton

Respondent and Defendant

FCA US LLC

Not Yet Classified

Martin W. Anderson

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7400

Aram Eric Aslanian

Glendale, CA 91202-2860

Lucy Kasparian

Glendale, CA 91202-2860

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Hallen D. Rosner

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbittt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Payam Shahian

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michelle A. Cook

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite. 100

San Diego, CA 92131-1100

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. Scutti

Attorney at Gates, O'Doherty, Gonter & Guy, LLP

38 Discovery - Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Matthew M. Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates, O'Doherty, Gonter & Guy, LLP

38 Discovery, Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Martin William Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Law Firm

2070 North Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7400

Aram Eric Aslanian

Attorney at Kasparian Law Group/CA Lemon Law Center

535 W. Glenoaks Boulevard

Glendale, CA 91202-2860

Lucy Kasparian

Attorney at California Lemon Law Center, Inc

535 W. Glenoaks Boulevard

Glendale, CA 91202-2860

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: B294528 - 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The requests to appear as counsel pro hac vice are granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40(a).) The petition for review is denied. The requests for an order directing depublication of the opinion are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application denied; Notes: Mark W. Anderson's, depublication requestor, application requesting permission to file a reply to the opposition to depublication request is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application filed; Notes: By Mark W. Anderson, depublication requestor, requesting permission to file his reply to the opposition to depublication request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Opposition to request for depublication filed by Martin W. Anderson.FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Thomas H. Dupree, Information only -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Matthew M. Proudfoot, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Lucy Kasparian Attorney: Lucy Kasparian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Aram Eric Aslanian Attorney: Aram Eric Aslanian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Martin W. Anderson Attorney: Martin William Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Thomas H. Dupree, Information only -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Matthew M. Proudfoot, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service reflecting service on opposing counsel Payam Shahian.FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Thomas H. Dupree, Information only -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- FCA US LLC, Defendant and Respondent Matthew M. Proudfoot, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brandon Crayton Attorney: Payam Shahian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: FCA US LLC Attorney: Matthew M. Proudfoot Attorney: Thomas H. Dupree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brandon Crayton Attorney: Payam Shahian ** consolidated with case #B296241 on August 19, 2019***** Order granting publication filed by the Court of Appeal on 4/22/2021. ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Motion and memorandum in support of pro hac vice admission of Matt Gregory representing defendants and respondent in this proceeding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Motion and memorandum in support of pro hac vice admission of Thomas H. Dupree Jr. representing defendants and respondent in this proceeding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one jacket - B294528

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brandon Crayton Attorney: Payam Shahian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B296241 B294528 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC654811

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin W. Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASLANIAN ARAM ERIC