This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2023 at 09:03:40 (UTC).

Cox v. Creative Investment Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Cox filed an Other lawsuit against Creative Investment Group, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maier, Clare. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5539

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maier, Clare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Derwin Cox

Defendants and Respondents

Creative Investment Group, Inc.

Sendy Giang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jason W. Estavillo

Attorney at Estavillo Law Group

426 17Th Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Elizabeth Brand Cermak

Attorney at Estavillo Lar Group

426 17Th Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Wayne Mark Abb

Attorney at Nussbaum APC

27489 Agoura Road Suite 102

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Alan Jeffrey Horwitz

Attorney at The Law Offices of Alan Horwitz

510 Third Street, Suite 101

Oakland, CA 94607

Thomas Patrick Sullivan

Attorney at Brown & Sullivan

1000 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 120

Alameda, CA 94501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Partial The request for immediate stay and the second petition for writ of supersedeas are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for immediate stay and the second petition for writ of supersedeas are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Vol. 2 FAC Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Vol. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED: Petitioner seeks an immediate stay, pursuant to CCP Section 923, to stay an Unlawful Detainer Action filed against Petitioners after the instant appeal was filed. Eviction 8/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Partial The temporary stay imposed July 5, 2022 is dissolved, and the petition for writ of supersedeas is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Elzabeth B. Cermak w/Estavillo Law Group, dated July 5, 2022, re: the petition for wrti submitted seeks to stay of a pending lock out date of July 6, 2022 at 6:01 a.m. (see full text of letter; duplicate)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Elzabeth B. Cermak w/Estavillo Law Group, dated July 5, 2022, re: the petition for wrti submitted seeks to stay of a pending lock out date of July 6, 2022 at 6:01 a.m. (see full text of letter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via TrueFiling when supersedeas petition was filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits in support of supersedeas petition -- Volume 2 FAC only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits in support of supersedeas petition, volume 2 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits in support of supersedeas petition; Volume 1 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: By Estavillo Law Firm, attorneys for appellant and petitioner Cox

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABB WAYNE M. ESQ.