This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/25/2021 at 23:41:34 (UTC).

County Records Research, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 County Records Research, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Watkins, Shirley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2767

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Watkins, Shirley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County Records Research, Inc.

Respondents

Hon. Shirley K. Watkins

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Zhirayr Alepyan

Magnum Property Investments, LLC

Next Generation TS FBO Allen Hershberg IRA 2750

Leyla Karapetyan

Allen Hershberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Keith Attlesey

Attorney at Attlesey | Storm, LLP

111 Pacifica, Suite 140

Irvine, CA 92618

John Patrick Ward

Attorney at Attlesey Storm LLP

111 Pacifica Suite 140

Irvine, CA 92618

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

James Lewis Goldman

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Harris L. Cohen

Attorney at Harris L. Cohen, APC

5305 Andasol Avenue

Encino, CA 91316

Jack M. LaPedis

Attorney at Law Offices of Jack M. LaPedis

4804 Laurel Canyon Blvd, Ste 1110

Valley Village, CA 91607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 1, 2021, and the preliminary opposition filed June 2, 2021. The petition is denied. Petitioner fails to provide an adequate record for review. Petitioner has not provided a reporter's transcript of the proceedings or a declaration "fairly summarizing the proceedings." (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b); Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187.) Based on the record provided, the petition is also denied because petitioner fails to demonstrate the respondent court did not have jurisdiction to rule on the motion for determination of a good faith settlement. (See Tech-Bilt, Inc. v. Woodward-Clyde & Associates (1985) 38 Cal.3d 488, 500, fn. 8.) Additionally, petitioner fails to establish the respondent court erred in finding the settlement was made in good faith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service re Real parties in interest opposition to writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 Responsive Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real parties in interest Allen Hershberg and Next Generation TS FBO Allen Hershberg IRA 2750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Preliminary Opposition to petition for writ of mandate; Declaration of James Goldman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits; Volumes 1-4 (Out of 4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND/OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD JOHN PATRICK