This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/24/2021 at 22:40:45 (UTC).

County of Tulare v. The Superior Court of Tulare County

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 County of Tulare filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Tulare County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ide, Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3029

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ide, Nathan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Tulare

Respondent

The Superior Court of Tulare County

Interested Parties

Brian Perez

Alba Dominguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kathleen A. Taylor

Attorney at Office Of The County Counsel

2900 W. Burrel Avenue

Visalia, CA 93291

Interested Party Attorneys

John Joseph Sarsfield

Attorney at Law Offices of Melo and Sarsfield LLP

4216 S Mooney Blvd Pmb 136

Visalia, CA 93277

Marguerite Melo

Attorney at Law Offices of Melo and Sarsfield LLP

4216 S Mooney Blvd Pmb 136

Visalia, CA 93277

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The "Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate . . .," filed on July 9, 2021, is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply to Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Peremptory Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief from Deputy Co. Counsel Taylor obo petnr Co. of Tulare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 one time responsive fee by counsel for RPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Dear Counsel: The responsive document entitled Opposition to Petition, filed with this court on July 20, 2021, was not accompanied by the $390 statutory filing fee required by Government Code section 68926, as amended by Assembly Bill No. 110, effective August 30, 2011. The court will strike the filing of the document if the filing fee or an application for waiver of court fees and costs under rule 8.26 of the California Rules of Court is not received within five (5) court days from the date of this notice. If you need further assistance, please contact the Clerk's Office at (559) 445-5491

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: By atty John Sarsfield et al for RPI Perez et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Vols 1 and 2 76 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate by County Counsel for County of Tualre request this Court to command the respondent Superior Court to vacate its Ruling overruling the demurrers to the Second, Third and Fourth causes of action and enter a new order sustaining them.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Writ info Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: petitioner is a government agency

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Tulare County is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF TULARE is a litigant