This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/02/2021 at 07:01:18 (UTC).

County of Santa Clara v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 County of Santa Clara filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Monahan, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9161

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Monahan, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Santa Clara

Respondent

Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Parties

Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.

Pacific Bell Telephone Company

T-Mobile West LLC

AT&T Mobility LLC

Sprint Communications Company, L.P.

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Petitioner Attorneys

Mark Francis Bernal

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Ward A. Penfold

Attorney at Santa Clara County Counsel's Office

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, Ninth

San Jose, CA 95110-2319

Hutchison Bruce Meltzer

Attorney at CA Dept of Justice

300 S Spring St Ste 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1256

Matthew Carter Dirkes

Attorney at Boersch & Illovsky LLP

1611 Telegraph Ave Ste 806

Oakland, CA 94612-2147

Martha Ann Boersch

Attorney at Boersch & Illovsky LLP

1611 Telegraph Ave Ste 806

Oakland, CA 94612-2147

Jessica Michael Weisel

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Rex Heinke

Attorney at California Appellate Law Group LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney Ward A. Penfold is no longer counsel of record for Petitioner. All future pleadings and communications should be address to Deputy County Counsel Mark F. Bernal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter from Real Parties in Interest informing the court of new authority not available in time to be included in briefing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amicus curiae letter submitted by the California State Association of Counties (CSAC) and the California Association of County Treasurers and Tax Collectors (CACTTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Real parties in interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Real parties in interest's response to petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition filed by 6/14/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition, exhibits, and request for judicial notice on all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Volumes 1-4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief ***STAY REQUESTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRINT TELEPHONY PCS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant