This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2023 at 13:29:56 (UTC).

County of San Francisco v. Rodgers

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 County of San Francisco filed an Other lawsuit against Rodgers. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3489

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

County of San Francisco

Robert Emmanuel Rodgers, Sr.

Appellant

Regina Rogers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Dennis J. Herrera

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: (Abandonment filed 9/17/21 and Amended Abandonment filed 9/20/21)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/19/21 by CT/RT; RT attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/12/2021 by Third Party Appellant Regina Rogers in propria persona appealing judgment from 06/17/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: FCS11346229

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less