This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/27/2022 at 16:38:35 (UTC).

County of Riverside v. The Superior Court of Riverside County/Swanson et al.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 County of Riverside filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Riverside County/Swanson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Asberry, Irma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9772

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Asberry, Irma

 

Party Details

Petitioner

County of Riverside

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Parties

Jeremy Swanson

Lesli Swanson-Harvey

Michael Andersen

Brooke Andersen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael J. Marlatt

Susan Knock Beck

Interested Party Attorneys

Ricardo Echeverria

Brian Joseph Panish

Kristin E Hobbs

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and/or other appropriate relief and request for immediate stay have been read and considered by Justices Aaron, Guerrero and Do. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and/or other appropriate relief and request for immediate stay have been read and considered by Justices Aaron, Guerrero and Do. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Division transfer notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Intra District Transfer to Division One.; Notes: CRC 10.1000(b)(1)(A)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: As to petition & exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ***EXHIBITS LODGED BY: ******; Notes: 4 volumes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate w/request for immediate stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less